MA S2258 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain building in the city of Fall River as the Captain Thomas Hudner Jr. Memorial Building. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Designating a certain building in the city of Fall River as the Captain Thomas Hudner Jr. Memorial Building
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] | Rep. Patricia Haddad [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] |
Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Rep. Alan Silvia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-11-06 | House | Enacted |
2019-11-04 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-10-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-10-15 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-06-13 | House | House concurred |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2257 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2258 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2258.pdf |