MA S2264 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2316
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - New draft substituted, see S2316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - New draft substituted, see S2316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate certain bridges in the town of Bourne as the U.S. Army Special Forces Staff Sergeant Matthew A. Pucino Memorial Bridges. Transportation.
Title
Designating certain bridges in the town of Bourne as the U.S. Army Special Forces Staff Sergeant Matthew A. Pucino Memorial Bridges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2316 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read second |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-01-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H1027 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1402 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3918 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2018
H1855 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H73 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2316 (Replaced by) 2018-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2018
H1402 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3918 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2018
H1855 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H73 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2316 (Replaced by) 2018-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2264 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2264.pdf |