MA S2266 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2348
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to invest in the Commonwealth’s schools. Education.
Title
Investing in the Commonwealth’s schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2348 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-06-19 | House | House concurred |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3953 (Similar To) 2020-10-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2020
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S330 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3953 (Similar To) 2020-10-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2020
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
S1113 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2711
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2266 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2266.pdf |