MA S2267 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the membership of the board of trustees and increasing quorum for the transaction of the corporate business of Amherst College. Higher Education.
Title
Increasing the membership of the board of trustees and increasing quorum for the transaction of the corporate business of Amherst College
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 245 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-31 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-07-14 | House | House concurred |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Higher Education |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2267 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2267.pdf |