MA S2270 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2794
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Accompanied a study order, see S2794
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - Accompanied a study order, see S2794
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to review the municipal Chapter 90 transportation funding program. Transportation.
Title
To review the municipal Chapter 90 transportation funding program
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Sen. Adam Gomez [D] | Rep. John Barrett [D] | Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2794 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2414 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2023
S2556 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2794 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2808 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2556 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2794 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2808 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2270 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2270.pdf |