MA S2273 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1817
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate the use of automatic license plate reader systems,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2273).
Title
To regulate the use of automatic license plate reader systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-05-02 | Senate | New draft of S1817 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1817 (Replaces) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2273
S2141 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Reprinted as amended, see S2168
H3068 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied H3315
S1648 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2266 (Similar To) 2016-11-10 - New draft substituted, see S2505
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S2141 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Reprinted as amended, see S2168
H3068 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied H3315
S1648 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2266 (Similar To) 2016-11-10 - New draft substituted, see S2505
S743 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S439 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2273 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2273.pdf |