MA S2276 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 378 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 378 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Department of Inspectional Services in the city of Lynn. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Department of Inspectional Services in the city of Lynn
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 378 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-11-13 | House | Enacted |
2014-11-10 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-10-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-10-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-10-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-10-09 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-07-17 | House | House concurred |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2276 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2276.pdf |