MA S2278 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1308
Note: Legislation replaced by S2296
Note: Legislation replaced by S2296
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure consumer choice and equal access to eye care,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2278).
Title
Ensuring consumer choice and equal access to eye care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2296 |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Read second |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the day for Thursday, July 25, 2019 |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2296 |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-27 | Senate | New draft of S1308 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1308 (Replaces) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H276 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S2296 (Replaced by) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H276 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S2296 (Replaced by) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2278 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2278.pdf |