MA S2287 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure the safety of residents, first responders, and gas workers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Ensuring the safety of residents, first responders, and gas workers
Sponsors
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Tackey Chan [D] | Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D] | Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] |
Rep. Timothy Toomey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-05-09 | House | House concurred |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S233 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S354 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
S1767 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1722 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1474 (Similar To) 2016-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1597 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H2792 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2854 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2275
S190 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
S354 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
S1767 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1722 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1474 (Similar To) 2016-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1597 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H2792 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H2854 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2275
S190 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2287 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2287.pdf |