MA S2297 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 351 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 351 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to improving notice requirements for self-storage,- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2297).
Title
Relative to improving notice requirements for self-storage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 351 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-10-09 | House | Enacted |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-10-02 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-08-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-07-24 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S183 |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S183 |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2297 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2297.pdf |