MA S2300 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2915
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - New Draft substituted, see S2915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - New Draft substituted, see S2915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Scituate to use certain land for general municipal purposes without Article 97 restrictions on such use. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Scituate to use certain land for general municipal purposes without Article 97 restrictions on such use
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | New Draft substituted, see S2915 |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Read third |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-07-23 | House | House concurred |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2202 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Accompanied H3698
S2292 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2019
H3915 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4920
H4007 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - New draft substituted, see H4805
H4009 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2020
H4038 (Similar To) 2020-02-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2020
S2335 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2781
H2953 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1200 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H2504 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S90 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S1199 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2374 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2019
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4198 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4225 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2019
H4224 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 127 of the Acts of 2019
H4219 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2020
H4221 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4775
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
H4277 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2020
S2915 (Replaced by) 2021-01-05 - Laid before the Govenor
S2292 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2019
H3915 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4920
H4007 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - New draft substituted, see H4805
H4009 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2020
H4038 (Similar To) 2020-02-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2020
S2335 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2781
H2953 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1200 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H2504 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S90 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S1199 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2374 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 126 of the Acts of 2019
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4198 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H4225 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2019
H4224 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 127 of the Acts of 2019
H4219 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2020
H4221 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4775
S2445 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - New draft substituted, see S2636
H4277 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2020
S2915 (Replaced by) 2021-01-05 - Laid before the Govenor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2300 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2300.pdf |