MA S2308 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2642
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to mobile carrying devices. Transportation.
Title
Relative to mobile carrying devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2642 |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H3750 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H4085 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
S2538 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S1619 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S221 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2026 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S981 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1322 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2994
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2642 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H449 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S1965 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3606 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1984 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied H2959
H3708 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H3750 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H4085 (Similar To) 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
S2538 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S278 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied S269
S1619 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S2316 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2964
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S994 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1907
S221 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2026 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S981 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1322 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - New draft substituted, see S2994
S170 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2642 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H449 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S1965 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3606 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1984 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied H2959
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2308 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2308.pdf |