MA S2326 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to retirement benefits for Mary Donna Nodurf. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for Mary Donna Nodurf
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Public Service |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-07-12 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2016-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2016 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-06-09 | House | House concurred |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1400 (Similar To) 2015-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1442 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2046
S1366 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S2046 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2227 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2016
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1293 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1398 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1277 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1278 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1400 (Similar To) 2015-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1442 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2046
S1366 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S2046 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2227 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2016
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1293 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1398 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1277 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1278 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2326 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2326.pdf |