MA S2326 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require drivers employed by companies transporting students to submit to alcohol and drug testing. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the operating of student pupil transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H101 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
S2538 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
H2582 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1595 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H101 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
S2538 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2758
H2582 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S2087 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H1595 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2326 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2326.pdf |