MA S2328 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2209
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee on Health Care Financing, to whom was referred the Senate bill to increase the presence of dental hygienists on the board of registration in dentistry (Senate, No. 2209); report recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2328).
Title
To increase the presence of dental hygienists on the board of registration in dentistry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-31 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-08-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-08-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-08-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-07-30 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Substituted for S2209 |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-06-26 | Senate | Recommended new draft of S2209 |
2012-06-26 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S2209 (Replaces) 2012-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2328
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2328 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118785&generalCourtId=1 |