MA S2344 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1894
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 259 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 259 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act requiring adequate education relative to the proper safety and operation of a motorcycle for minors
Title
An Act requiring adequate education relative to the proper safety and operation of a motorcycle for minors
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 259 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-07-29 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-07-29 | Enacted | |
2010-07-29 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2010-07-29 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2010-07-28 | Senate concurred in the House amendment | |
2010-07-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-06 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-06-09 | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-06-07 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendments pending | |
2010-06-07 | Referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | |
2010-06-07 | Committee recommended ought to pass with amendments, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered 4727 | |
2010-03-29 | Read; and referred to the House Committee On Ways and Means | |
2010-03-25 | Passed to be engrossed - 35 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See Senate Roll Call, No. 201) | |
2010-03-25 | Read third | |
2010-03-23 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-23 | Substituted for S1894 | |
2010-03-23 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-23 | New draft of S1894 | |
2010-03-23 | Reported from the committee on Senate Committee on Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1894 (Replaces) 2010-03-23 - Read second
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s02344.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st02/st02344.htm |