MA S2355 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to child passenger safety. Transportation.
Title
Relative to child passenger safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2455 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
S1072 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S1572 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S975 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1106 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
S1072 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S1572 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S975 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1106 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2355 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2355.pdf |