MA S2359 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 318 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 318 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act establishing a sick leave bank for Anthony Gerniglia, an employee of the Department of Youth Services The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate establishing a sick leave bank for Anthony Gerniglia, an employee of the Department of Youth Services (Senate, No. 2259),- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2359).
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Anthony Gerniglia, an employee of the Department of Youth Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 318 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-09-04 | House | Enacted |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-09-04 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-09-02 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-08-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-08-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-08-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-08-25 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Substituted for S2259 |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Rules supended |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2259 |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2359 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2359.pdf |