MA S2368 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to billboard permitting. Transportation.
Title
Relative to billboard permitting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-01-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1530 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1190 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S599 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H474 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1190 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S599 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
H474 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2368 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2368.pdf |