MA S2393 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2396
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-17 - New draft substituted, see S2396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-17 - New draft substituted, see S2396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Jessica R. Brand, an employee of the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Jessica R. Brand, an employee of the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-17 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2396 |
2014-11-17 | Senate | Read second |
2014-11-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-11-17 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2396 |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-11-03 | House | House concurred |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2396 (Replaced by) 2014-12-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2393 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2393.pdf |