MA S2393 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow Robert G. Gaynor to continue to serve in the position of Special Police Officer for the town of Halifax. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Allowing Robert G. Gaynor to continue to serve in the position of Special Police Officer for the town of Halifax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-04-09 | House | Enacted |
2020-04-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-02-05 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-11-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-11-06 | House | House concurred |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2393 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2393.pdf |