MA S2403 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2372
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - See S2372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - See S2372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate, Thursday, June 30, 2016 -- Text of amendment (61) (offered by Senator Eldridge) to the Ways and Means amendment (Senate, No. 2372) to the House Bill to promote energy diversity.
Title
Energy Efficiency and Green Jobs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | See S2372 |
Same As/Similar To
S2372 (Replaced by) 2016-06-30 - See H4385
S1766 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2979 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S1800 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied H2904
S1586 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1584 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1751 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2159
H2909 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied S1766
S1761 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1774 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1462 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1426 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1653 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2310
S1680 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1766 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2979 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S1800 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied H2904
S1586 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1584 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1751 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2159
H2909 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied S1766
S1761 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1774 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1462 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1426 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1653 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - New draft substituted, see S2310
S1680 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2403 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2403.pdf |