MA S2406 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2425
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-05 - Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-05 - Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the special election in the city known as the town of Greenfield. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the special election in the city known as the town of Greenfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-05 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-01-05 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2425 |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Read second |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-12-11 | House | House concurred |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S2425 (Replaced by)
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2406 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2406.pdf |