MA S2406 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S721
Note: Replaces legislation S750
Note: Replaces legislation S750
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation to streamline housing permitting, reports the accompanying Order (Senate, No. 2406).
Title
Order relative to authorizing the joint committee on Housing to make an investigation and study of certain current Senate documents relative to production and manufactured housing
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Accompanied by S721 and S750 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S721 (Replaces) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2406
S750 (Replaces) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2406
H4075 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4290
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S94 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
H978 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H703 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H704 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H651 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4536 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2018
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S750 (Replaces) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2406
H4075 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4290
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
S2358 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Reported (in part) by S2006
S94 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2361
H978 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H703 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H704 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H651 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H4536 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2018
H4981 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2406 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2406.pdf |