MA S2414 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S110
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation to authorize the issuance of temporary licenses for the sale and auction of wines and malt beverages by nonprofit charitable corporations,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2414).
Title
Authorizing the issuance of temporary licenses for the sale and auction of wines and malt beverages by nonprofit charitable corporations
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-04-12 | Senate | New draft of S110 and S114 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S110 (Replaces) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2414
S114 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2414
S904 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3546 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S1626 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S114 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2414
S904 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H3546 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S1626 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2414 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2414.pdf |