MA S2420 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2352
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 333 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 333 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Seekonk to convert seasonal licenses to annual licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2420).
Title
Authorizing the town of Seekonk to convert seasonal licenses to annual licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 333 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-11-21 | House | Enacted |
2012-11-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-10-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-10-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-10-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-10-09 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-10-04 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-10-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-08-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-08-30 | Senate | New draft of S2352 |
2012-08-30 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2352 (Replaces) 2012-08-30 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2420
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2420 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119762&generalCourtId=1 |