MA S2436 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2482
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2482
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2482
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide property tax exemptions for certain nonprofit senior housing in Boxford. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To provide property tax exemptions for certain nonprofit senior housing in Boxford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2482 |
2016-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/03/2016 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-07-18 | House | House concurred |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2482 (Replaced by) 2016-08-25 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2437 (Similar To) 2016-08-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1377 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1093 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4284
H1157 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1590 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S781 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2437 (Similar To) 2016-08-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1377 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1093 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4284
H1157 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1590 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S781 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1438 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2436 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2436.pdf |