MA S2457 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1928
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to school bus driver licensing,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2457).
Title
Relative to school bus driver licensing
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-19 | Senate | New draft of S1928 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1928 (Replaces) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2457
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H140 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H477 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S1166 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H1265 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H503 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H140 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H477 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S1166 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H1265 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2457 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2457.pdf |