MA S2464 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Bill reported favorably as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Bill reported favorably as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to modernize property tax abatements for veterans. Revenue.
Title
To modernize property tax abatements for veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2020-10-19 | House | House concurred |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-12 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday, June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/12/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2020-02-03 | House | House concurred |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2020-01-13 | House | House concurred |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2464 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2464.pdf |