MA S2465 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2538
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to quantify the SPED Gap by comparing actual special education costs to current special education assistance. Education.
Title
Quantifying the SPED Gap by comparing actual special education costs to current special education assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2538 |
2020-01-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2020-01-13 | House | House concurred |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2465 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2465.pdf |