MA S2475 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 454 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 454 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Sarah Bok, an employee of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Sarah Bok, an employee of the Trial Court
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 454 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-12-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-12-31 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third |
2012-12-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-12-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders |
2012-12-31 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2012-12-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2012-12-17 | House | House concurred |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S2475 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119893&generalCourtId=1 |