MA S2480 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2953
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to permit familial searching and partial DNA matches in investigating certain unsolved crimes. The Judiciary.
Title
Permitting familial searching and partial DNA matches in investigating certain unsolved crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2953 |
2020-10-26 | House | House concurred |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-21 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-17 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/13/2020 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2020-01-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2953 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2480 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2480.pdf |