MA S2490 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2734
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to enhanced enforcement of swimming limitations
Title
Relative to enhanced enforcement of swimming limitations
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2734 |
2021-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-07 | House | House concurred |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S42 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S2978
S191 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1331 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H887 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4010 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2021
S2543 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S76 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1104 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1752 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2568
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2270 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S2734 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S191 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1331 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H887 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4010 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2021
S2543 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S76 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1104 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1752 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H2568
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S2310 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S1177 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S2270 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
S2734 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2490 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2490.pdf |