MA S2497 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Scituate to establish the date of its annual town election
Title
Authorizing the town of Scituate to establish the date of its annual town election
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-02-06 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2497 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2497.pdf |