MA S2505 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2537
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the requirement to disclose mental health issues to the registrar. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the requirement to disclose mental health issues to the registrar
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2537 |
2018-05-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/21/2018 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-04-30 | House | House concurred |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H1839 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H381 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2537 (Replaced by) 2018-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H1839 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H381 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2537 (Replaced by) 2018-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2505 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2505.pdf |