MA S2541 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - Recommended new draft for S349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - Recommended new draft for S349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SENATE, Wednesday, June 6, 2018 - The committee on Health Care Financing, to whom was referred the Senate Resolve to examine cost trends and financial performance among nursing facilities (Senate, No. 349),-- reports recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2541).
Title
Resolve to examine cost trends and financial performance among nursing facilities
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S349 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S336 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2604
S337 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H340 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2072 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4787
H2070 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
S337 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H340 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2072 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4787
H2070 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2541 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2541.pdf |