MA S2550 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifying the town meeting of the town of Rowley
Title
Ratifying the town meeting of the town of Rowley
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-01-10 | House | Enacted |
2022-01-06 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-12-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-12-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-12-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-12-09 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-13 | House | House concurred |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S460 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Substituted by a bill, see H5067
S467 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1356 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2463 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
S24 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2021
S467 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1356 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2463 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S2487 (Similar To) 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 45 of the Acts of 2021
S24 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2550 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2550.pdf |