MA S2564 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to support MassMakers. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
To support MassMakers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2020-03-18 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2020-03-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2020-02-24 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2564 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2564.pdf |