MA S2573 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing humane transportation of K9 partners aka Nero's law
Title
Allowing humane transportation of K9 partners aka Nero's law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #102 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-02-07 | House | Enacted |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-02-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-03 | House | Read second, amended by substitution of a new text (H4431) and ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H4431) pending |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-11-15 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed - see Roll Call #102 (Yeas 38 – Nays 0) |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S1606 |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S1606 |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1606 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - New draft substituted, see S2573
H2547 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2547 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2573 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2573.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall102.pdf |