MA S2576 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2698
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to required minimum limits for damage to personal property. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to required minimum limits for damage to personal property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2698 |
2021-11-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-10 | House | House concurred |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S1865 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2128 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2505 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1488 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2698 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1873 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2971 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3583 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
S1865 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S2128 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2505 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1488 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2698 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1873 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2971 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3583 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2576 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2576.pdf |