MA S2589 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 315 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 315 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating special police officers in the city known as the town of Agawam
Title
Regulating special police officers in the city known as the town of Agawam
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 315 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-15 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-12-05 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2021-12-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-12-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-12-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-12-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted for S1369 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Velis) for S1369 |
Same As/Similar To
S1369 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2589
S1367 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - New draft (Velis) substituted, see S2523
S2523 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2022
H2714 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2021
H3762 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2022
H3754 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2021
H4870 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2022
S1367 (Similar To) 2021-09-02 - New draft (Velis) substituted, see S2523
S2523 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2022
H2714 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2021
H3762 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2022
H3754 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2021
H4870 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2589 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2589.pdf |