MA S26 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-27 - Accompanied S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-27 - Accompanied S2484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to certain land in Templeton under the control of the Department of Mental Retardation
Title
Relative to certain land in Templeton under the control of the Department of Mental Retardation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Accompanied S2484 |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2484 |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 04/05/2012 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2011-07-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities. |
Same As/Similar To
S2484 (Replaced by)
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S26 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7970&generalCourtId=1 |