MA S2600 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4741
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - See H4741
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - See H4741
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-12 - Senate - Senate Amendment Roll Call #439 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Senate | See H4741 |
Same As/Similar To
H4741 (Replaced by) 2018-07-16 - Committee of conference appointed (Chang-Diaz-DiDomenico-O'Connor), in concurrence
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H608 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H4962 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Resolve passed and laid before the Governor
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H608 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H4962 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Resolve passed and laid before the Governor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2600 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2600.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/190/SenateRollCall439.pdf |