MA S2611 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2990
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - New draft substituted, see S2990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-07 - New draft substituted, see S2990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the 2022 annual town meeting for the town of Tisbury.
Title
Relative to the 2022 annual town meeting for the town of Tisbury
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2990 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Read second |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2990 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-01-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-06 | House | House concurred |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S460 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Substituted by a bill, see H5067
S467 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S24 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2021
H4682 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 395 of the Acts of 2022
S2990 (Replaced by) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2022
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3860 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4222
H4240 (Similar To) 2022-08-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 196 of the Acts of 2022
H4222 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2022
S460 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Substituted by a bill, see H5067
S467 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S24 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2021
H4682 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 395 of the Acts of 2022
S2990 (Replaced by) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2022
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3860 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4222
H4240 (Similar To) 2022-08-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 196 of the Acts of 2022
H4222 (Similar To) 2022-02-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2611 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2611.pdf |