MA S2618 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4648
Note: Legislation replaced by S2651
Note: Legislation replaced by S2651
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing additional support to those affected by the novel coronavirus through the unemployment insurance system
Title
Providing additional support to those affected by the novel coronavirus through the unemployment insurance system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-05-21 | House | Enacted |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-05-21 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House still further amendment |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-05-21 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a still further amendment, striking all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of House document numbered 4734 |
2020-04-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment, see S2651 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-16 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-04-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-04-16 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered 4648 |
2020-04-02 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Reported on a part of S2598 |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4648 (Replaced by) 2020-04-16 - Text of an amendment, see S2618
S2651 (Replaced by) 2020-04-23 - see S2618
S2651 (Replaced by) 2020-04-23 - see S2618
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2618 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2618.pdf |