MA S2643 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Massachusetts Paycheck Protection Program (PPP) for businesses ineligible for the comparable federal PPP. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Establishing a Massachusetts Paycheck Protection Program (PPP) for businesses ineligible for the comparable federal PPP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-04-27 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-04-21 | House | House concurred |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2643 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2643.pdf |