MA S2650 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2631
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on August 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-06 - See S2631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-06 - See S2631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To promote and enhance civic engagement
Title
To promote and enhance civic engagement
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-06 | Senate | See S2631 |
Same As/Similar To
S2631 (Replaced by) 2018-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 296 of the Acts of 2018
S215 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S307 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H315 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H2016 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S2306 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2355
S215 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S307 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H315 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H2016 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
S2306 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - New draft substituted, see S2355
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2650 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2650.pdf |