MA S2656 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide emergency assistance to gateway cities for temporary homeless shelters. Housing.
Title
Providing emergency assistance to gateway cities for temporary homeless shelters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-05-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2020 from 09:00 AM-04:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-04-23 | House | House concurred |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2656 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2656.pdf |