MA S2663 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S266
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation relative to parental notification in public schools, report the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2663).
Title
To reduce exclusionary discipline for violations of rules related to student grooming and dress
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-03-21 | Senate | New draft of S266, S282, S285, S290, S294, S300, S305, S341 and S348 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S266 (Replaces) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2663
S290 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2663
S289 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2473 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4637 (Similar To) 2024-05-31 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2024 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S290 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2663
S289 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2473 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4637 (Similar To) 2024-05-31 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2024 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2663 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2663.pdf |