MA S2675 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a selectmen-administrator form of government for the town of Newbury. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing a selectmen-administrator form of government for the town of Newbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2018-11-26 | House | House concurred |
2018-11-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2067 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - New draft (Tarr) substituted, see S2161
S2161 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2017
S2161 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 97 of the Acts of 2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2675 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2675.pdf |